E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4970
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5212
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4623
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1473
|
Journal Page: 4623
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4623
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4340
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1722
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1459
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#758
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2839
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2818
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2818
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
House
|
01/21/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|