Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB833 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Clardy (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 833
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
3- April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Transportation; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
5- vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 833
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to certain holders of motor home manufacturer's and
126 dealer's licenses.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Section 2301.476(h), Occupations Code, is
159 amended to read as follows:
1610 (h) A person who on June 7, 1995, held both a motor home
1711 manufacturer's license and a motor home dealer's license issued
1812 under this chapter may:
1913 (1) [continue to] hold:
2014 (A) a motor home manufacturer's license;
2115 (B) a general distinguishing number issued under
2216 Chapter 503, Transportation Code; and
2317 (C) not more than two franchised dealer's
2418 licenses [both licenses]; and
2519 (2) operate as both a manufacturer and dealer of motor
2620 homes but of no other type of vehicle.
2721 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
2822 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
2923 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
3024 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
3125 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
32- * * * * *
26+ ______________________________ ______________________________
27+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
28+ I certify that H.B. No. 833 was passed by the House on April
29+ 16, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not
30+ voting.
31+ ______________________________
32+ Chief Clerk of the House
33+ I certify that H.B. No. 833 was passed by the Senate on May
34+ 21, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
35+ ______________________________
36+ Secretary of the Senate
37+ APPROVED: _____________________
38+ Date
39+ _____________________
40+ Governor