E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3137
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5304
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1681
|
Journal Page: 5304
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5304
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2415
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2414
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2414
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2414
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2414
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2658
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1575
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1459
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#830
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 2939
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2939
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/8/15 2:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2838
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2837
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2702
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#706
|
Journal Page: 2701
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Failed to pass
|
|
Journal Page: 2701
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2701
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2631
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
House
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 429
|
House
|
01/21/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|