House | 05/08/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2818 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1117 | Journal Page: 2818 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 564 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 564 | |
House | 01/21/2015 | Filed |