Senate | 05/15/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3174 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#959 | Journal Page: 3174 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3174 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3174 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Postponed | 5/12/15 1:45 PM | Journal Page: 3168 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3167 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3078 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#901 | Journal Page: 3077 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3077 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3077 | |
House | 05/09/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#686 | Journal Page: 2680 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2680 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 480 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 480 | |
House | 01/21/2015 | Filed |