House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 850 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 850 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 543 | |
House | 03/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 543 | |
House | 01/21/2015 | Filed |