1 | 1 | | 84R1521 CJC-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: White of Tyler H.B. No. 86 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the creation of a select committee to evaluate the |
---|
8 | 8 | | effects of a reduction in or the elimination of federal funding on |
---|
9 | 9 | | the state budget due to federal fiscal policy. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 10, Government Code, is |
---|
12 | 12 | | amended by adding Chapter 2116 to read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | CHAPTER 2116. SELECT COMMITTEE ON BUDGET DEPENDENCE ON FEDERAL |
---|
14 | 14 | | FUNDING |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 2116.001. DEFINITION. In this chapter, "committee" |
---|
16 | 16 | | means the Select Committee on Budget Dependence on Federal Funding. |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 2116.002. COMPOSITION. (a) The committee is composed |
---|
18 | 18 | | of: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) four members of the senate, including members from |
---|
20 | 20 | | different political parties, appointed by the lieutenant governor |
---|
21 | 21 | | based on seniority; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) four members of the house of representatives, |
---|
23 | 23 | | including members from different political parties, appointed by |
---|
24 | 24 | | the speaker of the house of representatives based on seniority; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (3) a representative of a nonprofit or charitable |
---|
26 | 26 | | organization appointed by the governor; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (4) a representative of an advocacy organization |
---|
28 | 28 | | focused on state and federal fiscal matters appointed by the |
---|
29 | 29 | | governor; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (5) a representative of the Legislative Budget Board |
---|
31 | 31 | | appointed by the Legislative Budget Board; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (6) a representative of the comptroller's office, |
---|
33 | 33 | | appointed by the comptroller. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (b) The committee shall elect a presiding officer from among |
---|
35 | 35 | | its members. |
---|
36 | 36 | | Sec. 2116.003. COMPENSATION. A committee member serves |
---|
37 | 37 | | without compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for actual |
---|
38 | 38 | | and necessary expenses incurred in performing functions as a |
---|
39 | 39 | | committee member, subject to any applicable limitation on |
---|
40 | 40 | | reimbursement provided by general law or the General Appropriations |
---|
41 | 41 | | Act. |
---|
42 | 42 | | Sec. 2116.004. COMMITTEE DUTIES. The committee shall: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) meet at the call of the presiding officer; |
---|
44 | 44 | | (2) conduct a study on: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (A) the percentage of the state budget that is |
---|
46 | 46 | | funded by federal money; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (B) the effects on the state budget if federal |
---|
48 | 48 | | fiscal policy necessitates a significant reduction in or the |
---|
49 | 49 | | elimination of federal funding for state governments; and |
---|
50 | 50 | | (3) create a plan to address the loss of federal money, |
---|
51 | 51 | | including federal Medicaid matching money and federal social |
---|
52 | 52 | | security payments, and maintain benefit programs and other |
---|
53 | 53 | | essential state services if federal fiscal policy necessitates a |
---|
54 | 54 | | significant reduction in or the elimination of federal funding for |
---|
55 | 55 | | state governments. |
---|
56 | 56 | | Sec. 2116.005. REPORT. Not later than September 1, 2016, |
---|
57 | 57 | | the committee shall submit a report based on its findings to: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (1) the governor; |
---|
59 | 59 | | (2) the lieutenant governor; and |
---|
60 | 60 | | (3) the speaker of the house of representatives. |
---|
61 | 61 | | Sec. 2116.006. EXPIRATION. This chapter expires and the |
---|
62 | 62 | | committee is abolished December 1, 2016. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 2. (a) Not later than October 1, 2015, the |
---|
64 | 64 | | lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, |
---|
65 | 65 | | the governor, the comptroller of public accounts, and the |
---|
66 | 66 | | Legislative Budget Board shall make the appointments and |
---|
67 | 67 | | designations required by Section 2116.002(a), Government Code, as |
---|
68 | 68 | | added by this Act. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (b) Not later than November 1, 2015, the governor shall call |
---|
70 | 70 | | the first meeting of the Select Committee on Budget Dependence on |
---|
71 | 71 | | Federal Funding to permit the committee to elect a presiding |
---|
72 | 72 | | officer as required by Section 2116.002(b), Government Code, as |
---|
73 | 73 | | added by this Act. |
---|
74 | 74 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|