House | 05/04/2015 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2406 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 344 | Journal Page: 2406 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Postponed | 5/4/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2183 |
House | 04/30/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2183 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Postponed | 4/30/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 2029 |
House | 04/28/2015 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2029 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Postponed | 4/28/15 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 1910 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1910 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1706 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 601 | |
House | 03/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 601 | |
House | 01/21/2015 | Filed |