E
|
06/04/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/04/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1992
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2024
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1588
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1026
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3309
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3231
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3231
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1944
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 481
|
House
|
01/22/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|