E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2861
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1644
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5144
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4809
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2361
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1336
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1254
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2118
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Withdrawn from schedule
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
House
|
03/05/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 564
|
House
|
01/22/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|