Senate | 05/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1609 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#937 | Journal Page: 3157 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3157 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3156 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3053 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3053 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 481 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 481 | |
House | 01/22/2015 | Filed |