E
|
06/13/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6048
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6047
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3345
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 1032
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3344
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5556
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5535
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR 3384
|
Journal Page: 5531
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2876
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5209
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2675
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2662
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4867
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4867
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4867
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4867
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1585
|
Journal Page: 4866
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 4866
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Motion to concur in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4866
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1902
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA12 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
FA9 Huffines
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA10 Huffman
|
Journal Page: 1900
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1899
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/22/15 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 1894
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1886
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1942
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1004
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1830
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#297
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1742
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
4-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Amended
|
3-Dutton and Rinaldi
|
Journal Page: 1739
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1737
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#279
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1691
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Amended
|
18-Schaefer
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
17-Huberty
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
16-C. Turner
|
Journal Page: 1685
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 1680
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
11-Fletcher
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
8-Johnson
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
9-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 1674
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(4)
|
Journal Page: 1664
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1547
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 4, Section 20
|
Journal Page: 1545
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1545
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 448
|
House
|
02/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 448
|
House
|
01/23/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|