E | 06/20/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/20/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4984 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2290 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4570 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4336 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1914 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1913 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1097 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1945 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1858 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#348 | Journal Page: 1857 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1857 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1857 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1812 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Amended | 1-S. Thompson | Journal Page: 1812 |
House | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1812 | |
House | 04/22/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1375 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 482 | |
House | 01/26/2015 | Filed |