House | 05/12/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 483 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 483 | |
House | 01/27/2015 | Filed |