Senate | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1628 | |
House | 05/17/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3788 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3625 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1154 | Journal Page: 3624 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3624 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3624 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3521 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Record vote | RV#1097 | Journal Page: 3520 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3520 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Amended | 1-Capriglione | Journal Page: 3520 |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3520 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 484 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 484 | |
House | 01/27/2015 | Filed |