Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB967 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/27/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R1027 EES-D
 By: Crownover H.B. No. 967


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot project to evaluate the use of radio frequency
 identification technology to transmit information regarding
 residents of certain group homes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 161, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 161.088 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.088.  RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION TECHNOLOGY
 PILOT PROJECT. (a) In this section, "radio frequency
 identification technology" means a wireless identification system
 that uses an electromagnetic radio frequency signal to transmit
 data without physical contact between a card, badge, or tag and
 another device.
 (b)  The department shall develop and implement a one-year
 pilot project in which a resident of a group home, other than a
 foster home, at which a Home and Community-based Services (HCS)
 provider provides services may use an identification device that
 uses radio frequency identification technology or similar
 technology to identify the resident, transmit information
 regarding the resident, or track the location of the resident.
 (c)  Before a resident may use an identification device
 described in Subsection (b), the department must obtain the written
 consent of the resident or the resident's guardian, as appropriate.
 (d)  The department may not require a resident to pay for an
 identification device described in Subsection (b) as a condition of
 participating in the pilot project.
 (e)  Not later than December 1, 2017, the department shall
 submit a report to the legislature evaluating the pilot project.
 (f)  This section expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the Department of
 Aging and Disability Services shall ensure that the pilot project
 required by Section 161.088, Human Resources Code, as added by this
 Act, is in operation.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.