E | 05/21/2015 | See remarks for effective date | ||
E | 05/21/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4218 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3406 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1495 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2829 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2674 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1380 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1379 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1249 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1200 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1091 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 958 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1746 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Record vote | RV#245 | Journal Page: 1635 |
House | 04/17/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1635 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1635 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1612 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1612 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Amended | 1-Geren | Journal Page: 1612 |
House | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1612 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1499 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 485 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 485 | |
House | 01/27/2015 | Filed |