Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB976 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Collier H.B. No. 976
22
33
44 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
55 AN ACT
66 relating to higher education for veterans and their families.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Chapter 54, Education Code, is amended by
99 amending Subsections (a), (a-3) and (a-4) and adding Subsection
1010 (a-5) to read as follows:
1111 (a) The governing board of each institution of higher
1212 education shall exempt the following persons from the payment of
1313 tuition, dues, fees, and other required charges, including fees for
1414 correspondence courses but excluding general deposit fees, student
1515 services fees, and any fees or charges for lodging, board, or
1616 clothing, provided the person seeking the exemption currently
1717 resides in this state and entered the service at a location in this
1818 state, declared this state as the person's home of record in the
1919 manner provided by the applicable military or other service, or
2020 would have been determined to be is a resident of this state for
2121 purposes under Subchapter B at the time the person entered the
2222 service on the date of registration:
2323 (1) all nurses and honorably discharged members of the
2424 armed forces of the United States who served during the
2525 Spanish-American War or during World War I;
2626 (2) all nurses, members of the Women's Army Auxiliary
2727 Corps, members of the Women's Auxiliary Volunteer Emergency
2828 Service, and all honorably discharged members of the armed forces
2929 of the United States who served during World War II except those who
3030 were discharged from service because they were over the age of 38 or
3131 because of a personal request on the part of the person that the
3232 person be discharged from service;
3333 (3) all honorably discharged men and women of the
3434 armed forces of the United States who served during the national
3535 emergency which began on June 27, 1950, and which is referred to as
3636 the Korean War; and
3737 (4) all persons who were honorably discharged from the
3838 armed forces of the United States after serving on active military
3939 duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days and who served a
4040 portion of their active duty during:
4141 (A) the Cold War which began on the date of the
4242 termination of the national emergency cited in Subdivision (3);
4343 (B) the Vietnam era which began on December 21,
4444 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975;
4545 (C) the Grenada and Lebanon era which began on
4646 August 24, 1982, and ended on July 31, 1984;
4747 (D) the Panama era which began on December 20,
4848 1989, and ended on January 21, 1990;
4949 (E) the Persian Gulf War which began on August 2,
5050 1990, and ends on the date thereafter prescribed by Presidential
5151 proclamation or September 1, 1997, whichever occurs first;
5252 (F) the national emergency by reason of certain
5353 terrorist attacks that began on September 11, 2001; or
5454 (G) any future national emergency declared in
5555 accordance with federal law.
5656 (a-3) A person who before the 2011-2012 academic year
5757 received an exemption provided by Subsection (a) continues to be
5858 eligible for the exemption provided by that subsection as that
5959 subsection existed on January 1, 2011, subject to the other
6060 provisions of this section other than the requirement of Subsection
6161 (a) that the person must currently reside in this state. that the
6262 person must have entered the service at a location in this state,
6363 declared this state as the person's home of record, or would have
6464 been determined to be a resident of this state for the purposes of
6565 Subchapter B at the time the person entered service.
6666 (a-4) A person who before the 2014-2015 academic year
6767 received an exemption under this section continues to be eligible
6868 for the exemption provided by this section as this section existed
6969 on January 1, 2013. subject to the other provisions of this section
7070 other than the requirement of Subsection (a) that the person must
7171 have entered the service at a location in this state, declared this
7272 state as the person's home of record, or would have been determined
7373 to be a resident of this state for purposes of Subchapter B at the
7474 time the person entered the service.
7575 (a-5) A person who before the 2015-2016 academic year
7676 received an exemption under this section continues to be eligible
7777 for the exemption provided by this section as this section existed
7878 on January 1, 2015, other than the requirement of Subsection (a)
7979 that the person must have entered the service at a location in this
8080 state, declared this state as the person's home of record, or would
8181 have been determined to be a resident of this state for the purposes
8282 of Subchapter B at the time the person entered the service.
8383 (b) The exemptions provided for in Subsection (a) also apply
8484 to:
8585 (1) the children of members of the armed forces of the
8686 United States:
8787 (A) who are or were killed in action;
8888 (B) who die or died while in service;
8989 (C) who are missing in action;
9090 (D) whose death is documented to be directly
9191 caused by illness or injury connected with service in the armed
9292 forces of the United States; or
9393 (E) who became totally and permanently disabled
9494 or meet the eligibility requirements for individual
9595 unemployability according to the disability ratings of the
9696 Department of Veterans Affairs as a result of a service-related
9797 injury; and
9898 (2) the children of members of the Texas National
9999 Guard and the Texas Air National Guard who:
100100 (A) were killed since January 1, 1946, while on
101101 active duty either in the service of their state or the United
102102 States; or
103103 (B) are totally and permanently disabled or meet
104104 the eligibility requirements for individual unemployability
105105 according to the disability ratings of the Department of Veterans
106106 Affairs, regardless of whether the members are eligible to receive
107107 disability benefits from the department, as a result of a
108108 service-related injury suffered since January 1, 1946, while on
109109 active duty either in the service of this state or the United
110110 States.
111111 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately, if it
112112 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
113113 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
114114 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary to take effect on
115115 that date, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.