Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB992 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Bonnen of Brazoria, et al. H.B. No. 992
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 14,
 Nays 0; May 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the total
 appraised value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse
 of a 100 percent or totally disabled veteran.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.131(c), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (c)  The surviving spouse of a disabled veteran who qualified
 for an exemption under Subsection (b) when the disabled veteran
 died, or of a disabled veteran who would have qualified for an
 exemption under that subsection if that subsection had been in
 effect on the date the disabled veteran died, is entitled to an
 exemption from taxation of the total appraised value of the same
 property to which the disabled veteran's exemption applied, or to
 which the disabled veteran's exemption would have applied if the
 exemption had been authorized on the date the disabled veteran
 died, if:
 (1)  the surviving spouse has not remarried since the
 death of the disabled veteran; and
 (2)  the property:
 (A)  was the residence homestead of the surviving
 spouse when the disabled veteran died; and
 (B)  remains the residence homestead of the
 surviving spouse.
 SECTION 2.  Section 11.131, Tax Code, as amended by this Act,
 applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed for a tax year beginning on
 or after January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, authorizing the legislature to provide for
 an exemption from ad valorem taxation of all or part of the market
 value of the residence homestead of the surviving spouse of a 100
 percent or totally disabled veteran who died before the law
 authorizing a residence homestead exemption for such a veteran took
 effect is approved by the voters. If that amendment is not approved
 by the voters, this Act has no effect.
 * * * * *