E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2311
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1480
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4639
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1794
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1625
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1060
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#324
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1797
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1551
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
House
|
01/28/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|