Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB995 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: González (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 995
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
3- May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Intergovernmental Relations; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by
5- the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 995
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the establishment of stormwater control and recapture
126 planning authorities in certain counties.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 12, Local Government Code, is
159 amended by adding Chapter 391A to read as follows:
1610 CHAPTER 391A. STORMWATER CONTROL AND RECAPTURE PLANNING
1711 AUTHORITIES IN CERTAIN COUNTIES
1812 Sec. 391A.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1913 (1) "Affected county" means a county that:
2014 (A) has a population of 800,000 or more; and
2115 (B) receives an average annual rainfall of 15
2216 inches or less based on the most recent 10-year period according to
2317 data available from a reliable source, including the United States
2418 Department of Agriculture Natural Resources Conservation Service
2519 or the PRISM Climate Group, Oregon State University.
2620 (2) "Authority" means a commission established under
2721 this chapter.
2822 Sec. 391A.002. ESTABLISHMENT. (a) A stormwater control and
2923 recapture planning authority is established in each affected county
3024 in this state.
3125 (b) An authority is a political subdivision of this state.
3226 Sec. 391A.003. TERRITORY. The territory of an authority
3327 includes all of the territory in the affected county in which the
3428 authority is located except any territory within the boundaries or
3529 extraterritorial jurisdiction of that county's largest
3630 municipality, provided that the municipality has a plan in place
3731 for the control of stormwater on the date the authority is
3832 established.
3933 Sec. 391A.004. BOARD OF DIRECTORS. The governing body of an
4034 authority is a board of directors composed of:
4135 (1) a representative of the county in which the
4236 authority is located and each municipality within the territory of
4337 the authority;
4438 (2) a representative of each water utility within the
4539 territory of the authority not also described by Subdivision (1);
4640 (3) a representative of each water district within the
4741 territory of the authority that has been in operation for at least
4842 15 years; and
4943 (4) each member of the state legislature whose
5044 legislative district is wholly or partly in the territory of the
5145 authority.
5246 Sec. 391A.005. POWERS AND DUTIES. (a) An authority shall:
5347 (1) coordinate and adopt a long-range master plan to
5448 facilitate the development and management of integrated stormwater
5549 control and recapture projects and facilities within the
5650 authority's territory;
5751 (2) apply for, accept, and receive gifts, grants,
5852 loans, and other money available from any source, including the
5953 state, the federal government, and an entity represented on the
6054 board of directors under Sections 391A.004(1), (2), and (3), to
6155 perform its purposes; and
6256 (3) assist an entity represented on the board of
6357 directors under Sections 391A.004(1), (2), and (3) in carrying out
6458 an objective included in the authority's master plan.
6559 (b) The authority may:
6660 (1) enter into contracts as necessary to carry out the
6761 authority's powers and duties; and
6862 (2) employ staff and consult with and retain experts.
6963 (c) The authority may not:
7064 (1) impose a tax or issue bonds; or
7165 (2) regulate the structures or facilities of an
7266 electric utility as "electric utility" is defined by Section
7367 31.002, Utilities Code.
7468 Sec. 391A.006. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires
7569 September 1, 2023.
7670 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7771 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7872 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7973 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8074 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
81- * * * * *
75+ ______________________________ ______________________________
76+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
77+ I certify that H.B. No. 995 was passed by the House on April
78+ 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 122, Nays 17, 1 present, not
79+ voting.
80+ ______________________________
81+ Chief Clerk of the House
82+ I certify that H.B. No. 995 was passed by the Senate on May
83+ 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
84+ ______________________________
85+ Secretary of the Senate
86+ APPROVED: _____________________
87+ Date
88+ _____________________
89+ Governor