Senate | 05/20/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1690 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Record vote | RV#1213 | Journal Page: 3827 |
House | 05/19/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3827 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3827 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2650 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Filed |