E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/27/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5213 | |
Senate | 05/27/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2559 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4807 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4984 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4574 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2017 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2017 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2017 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2017 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1944 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1782 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1674 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1674 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3566 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1115 | Journal Page: 3565 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3565 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3565 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3266 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Filed |