House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2103 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 2002 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Filed |