E | 05/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4468 | |
E | 05/14/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1593 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3545 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3548 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3263 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1511 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1511 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 1511 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1510 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1940 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Filed |