E | 05/22/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4344 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3406 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1537 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3134 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3267 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3108 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1504 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1378 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2564 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Filed |