House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4343 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Filed |