E | 06/15/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/22/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4344 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1897 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4214 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3908 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1786 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3641 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3641 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Filed |