Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR122 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 8, 2015

House Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 22, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill May 26, 2015