E | 06/15/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6048 | |
E | 05/25/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4774 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2028 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4344 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4086 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1848 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1805 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3913 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3913 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Filed |