E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6025 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5692 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5697 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5209 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 3102 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2851 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4987 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4987 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4082 | |
House | 05/19/2015 | Filed |