E | 06/17/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/29/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5697 | |
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5207 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5213 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4812 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 2337 | |
Senate | 05/26/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2310 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Record vote | RV#1460 | Journal Page: 4579 |
House | 05/26/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4579 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 4579 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4756 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 4756 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 4213 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Filed |