E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6025 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3504 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5692 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6025 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5565 | |
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 3439 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2863 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Record vote | RV#1654 | Journal Page: 5188 |
House | 05/28/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5188 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5188 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Filed |