E | 06/18/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 06/01/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6047 | |
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3626 | |
House | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6045 | |
House | 05/31/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6047 | |
House | 05/31/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 6023 | |
Senate | 05/31/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3616 | |
Senate | 05/31/2015 | Adopted | HB 1919 | Journal Page: 3616 |
Senate | 05/31/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 3616 | |
Senate | 05/31/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3616 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2851 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4992 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Record vote | RV#1605 | Journal Page: 4991 |
House | 05/28/2015 | Adopted | HB 1919 | Journal Page: 4991 |
House | 05/28/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4991 | |
House | 05/26/2015 | Filed |