E | 06/18/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6049 | |
E | 06/01/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6047 | |
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3624 | |
House | 05/31/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6020 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6025 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5696 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3508 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Adopted | HB 30 | Journal Page: 3508 |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 3508 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3508 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2863 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 5190 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Record vote | RV#1655 | Journal Page: 5189 |
House | 05/28/2015 | Adopted | HB 30 | Journal Page: 5189 |
House | 05/28/2015 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 5189 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4992 | |
House | 05/28/2015 | Filed |