E | 06/02/2015 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 6047 | |
Senate | 06/01/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3624 | |
House | 05/31/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6020 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6025 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5696 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3509 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Adopted | HB 1926 | Journal Page: 3509 |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 3509 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3509 | |
Senate | 05/29/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 3393 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Record vote | RV#1734 | Journal Page: 5559 |
House | 05/29/2015 | Adopted | HB 1926 | Journal Page: 5559 |
House | 05/29/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 5559 | |
House | 05/29/2015 | Filed |