House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 542 | |
House | 12/03/2014 | Filed |