E | 03/24/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1032 | |
E | 03/23/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 516 | |
House | 03/19/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 948 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 949 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 857 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 501 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 386 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 495 | |
House | 12/11/2014 | Filed |