Senate | 05/26/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2310 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4537 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Record vote | RV#1455 | Journal Page: 4536 |
House | 05/25/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 4536 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 4536 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 549 | |
House | 01/08/2015 | Filed |