E | 04/21/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1830 | |
E | 04/15/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1632 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 820 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 386 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 641 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 641 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/09/2015 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 495 | |
House | 01/14/2015 | Filed |