House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 495 | |
House | 01/15/2015 | Filed |