E | 02/05/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 250 | |
E | 02/03/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 235 | |
Senate | 02/03/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 174 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 212 | |
House | 01/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 213 | |
House | 01/28/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 129 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 89 | |
House | 01/26/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 193 | |
House | 01/26/2015 | Record vote | RV#19 | Journal Page: 193 |
House | 01/26/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 193 | |
House | 01/26/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 192 | |
House | 01/26/2015 | Filed |