E | 02/17/2015 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 372 | |
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 180 | |
House | 02/04/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 234 | |
House | 02/03/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 235 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 144 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 144 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 144 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 144 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 144 | |
House | 01/28/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 206 | |
House | 01/28/2015 | Filed |