E | 02/17/2015 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 372 | |
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 219 | |
House | 02/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 324 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 325 | |
House | 02/10/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 265 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 192 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 192 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 192 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 192 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 169 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Record vote | RV#24 | Journal Page: 210 |
House | 02/02/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 210 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 210 | |
House | 02/02/2015 | Filed |