E | 03/13/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 760 | |
E | 03/04/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 320 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 500 | |
House | 02/27/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 500 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 450 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 274 | |
House | 02/24/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 433 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Filed |