Senate | 05/24/2015 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1860 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4344 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3979 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | RV#1265 | Journal Page: 3978 |
House | 05/21/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3978 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3978 | |
House | 05/21/2015 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2810 | |
House | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 892 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |