E | 03/27/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1063 | |
E | 03/16/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 791 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 387 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 705 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 705 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Read | Journal Page: 375 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 374 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 374 | |
House | 03/11/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 621 | |
House | 03/10/2015 | Filed |