E | 05/18/2015 | Vetoed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3846 | |
E | 05/06/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2811 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1313 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2476 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2448 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1302 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1103 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1848 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | RV#341 | Journal Page: 1851 |
House | 04/23/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1851 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1842 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/24/2015 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 03/12/2015 | Filed |