Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR86 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 86


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The citizens of Amarillo lost an exemplary public
 official with the passing of city council member James Harold Simms
 on November 12, 2014, at the age of 73; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Amarillo on January 1, 1941, Jim Simms was
 raised in Clovis, New Mexico, and pursued his college education at
 Eastern New Mexico University, where he earned degrees in business,
 finance, and psychology; and
 WHEREAS, Following graduation, Mr. Simms settled in
 Amarillo; he operated the Mitchell Electric Company for 28 years
 before selling the business in 1999, then worked for another 11
 years as a vice president of Amarillo National Bank; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Simms began his distinguished career in public
 service in 1982, when he was elected to the board of the Amarillo
 Independent School District, and he held that office for five
 years, including a stint as board president; during the 1990s, he
 was president of the Amarillo Hospital District board of managers;
 and
 WHEREAS, In 2005, this respected civic leader was elected as
 the Place 4 representative on the Amarillo City Commission, and he
 went on to earn reelection four times, most recently in May 2013,
 six months before the city commission converted to a council;
 during his time in city government, he worked tirelessly to benefit
 his community and played an important role in securing additional
 water resources and furthering economic development efforts; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Simms was active in state government as well,
 accepting appointments from Governor George W. Bush as executive
 chair of the board of trustees of the Teacher Retirement System of
 Texas and from Governor Rick Perry to become a member of the State
 Securities Board; in addition, he was president of Kids Inc. and of
 the Children's Learning Centers board of directors, and he worked
 with United Way of Amarillo and Canyon; in recognition of his
 accomplishments, he was named Man of the Year by the Amarillo
 Globe-News in 1997; and
 WHEREAS, A caring husband and father, Mr. Simms shared a
 rewarding 57-year marriage with his wife, Freeda; they raised three
 children, Jane, J. Fred, and Lee, and with the passing years, they
 had the pleasure of seeing their family grow to include six
 grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, A man of great integrity and ability, Jim Simms
 dedicated himself to serving the city that he loved, and he leaves
 behind a legacy of generosity and civic engagement that will
 continue to inspire all those who had the good fortune to know him;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 84th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of James Harold Simms and extend
 sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his wife,
 Freeda Simms; to his children, Jane Simms Gillette and her husband,
 Greg, J. Fred Simms and his wife, Whitney, and Lee Simms and his
 wife, Theresa; to his grandchildren, Jacob Gillette and Lila,
 Benjamin, Luke, Ruby, and Fred Simms; to his brother, Mickey Simms,
 and his wife, Irene; to his nephews, Gerald Wade Simms, Mitch Simms
 and his wife, Mychelle, and their sons, Paden and Garret, and Gary
 Simms and his wife, Amy, and their daughters, Rylee and Haley; and
 to his other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 James Harold Simms.
 Smithee
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 86 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 26, 2015.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 86 was adopted by the Senate on
 April 7, 2015, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor