E | 04/21/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1830 | |
E | 04/15/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1632 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 820 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1491 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 674 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1370 | |
House | 04/06/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1370 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1363 | |
House | 03/18/2015 | Filed |